Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dalila Villanueva Lopez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Christopher Bates Adamson, against Does 1 - 100 Inclusive, Robert Samuel Halkides, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed by Dalila Villanueva Lopez against Robert Samuel Halkides and Does 1-100. The complaint alleges negligence and seeks damages. The incident in question is a motor vehicle collision that occurred on August 6, 2020, in Seaside, C...
2022.08.02 - CCCS - To file
Date: August 03, 20222022.08.02 - Complaint - To File
Date: August 03, 20222022.08.02 - Summons - To file
Date: August 03, 2022Long-POS- Dalia Villanurva Lopez vs. Robert Samuel Halkides et al.- SIGNED
Date: August 10, 2022ntc of settlemt
Date: November 29, 2022310193.1128161.25RFDLopez
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 310193.1128161.25RFDLopez | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Full | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ntc of settlemt | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Long-POS- Dalia Villanurva Lopez vs. Robert Samuel Halkides et al.- SIGNED | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.08.02 - CCCS - To file | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.08.02 - Complaint - To File | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.08.02 - Summons - To file | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Assignment and CMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.