Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mott, Julie, Munger, Ron, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Beck, David, against Loeb, Mary, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2022 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
(Munger) Notice - Lis Pendens RECORDED
Date: January 27, 20222022.02.24 Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 25, 2022(Munger) Notice - Remote App
Date: March 16, 20222022.03.31 App for Pro Hac Vice - Notice
Date: April 01, 20222022.03.31 App for Pro Hac Vice - PROPOSED Order
Date: April 01, 20222022.03.31 App for Pro Hac Vice - Application
Date: April 01, 20222022.03.31 App for Pro Hac Vice - POS
Date: April 01, 20222022.03.31 App for Pro Hac Vice - Decl of Cavitch
Date: April 01, 20222022.04.08 Answer
Date: April 08, 20222022.04.25 Notice of Non-Oppo to App Pro Hac Vice
Date: April 28, 20222022.05.09 NoE of Order for Pro Hac Vice
Date: May 09, 20222022.05.10 Joint CMS for CMC on 2022.05.23
Date: May 10, 2022(Munger) FAC
Date: July 15, 2022(Munger) Stip and Order - FAC DRB Signed
Date: July 15, 2022(Munger) Summons
Date: July 15, 2022(Munger) Summons
Date: July 20, 2022(Munger) Stip and Order - FAC - EXECUTED
Date: July 20, 2022POS on FAC
Date: July 26, 2022(Munger) FAC
Date: July 26, 2022(Munger) Summons
Date: July 26, 2022(Munger) 08-23 2022 CMC Stmt
Date: August 09, 20222022.08.11 Def ML's AMENDED CMS for CMC on 2022.08.23
Date: August 12, 20222022.08.25 Answer to FAC
Date: August 26, 20222022.08.25 Stip and PROPOSED Order to File X-Complaint
Date: August 26, 20222022.09.06 Summons on Cross-Complaint
Date: September 06, 20222022.09.06 Cross-Complaint
Date: September 06, 20222022.09.13 Proof of Service - Lyng
Date: September 16, 20222022.09.10 Proof of Service - Alvarez
Date: September 16, 2022Answer to Loeb Cross-Complaint 10-10-22
Date: October 10, 2022(Munger) 2022 11-09 CMC Stmt
Date: October 24, 2022Def ML's CMS for CMC on 2022.11.09
Date: November 08, 2022(Munger) Notice of Trial Setting
Date: November 10, 2022Sub of Atty of SBJLGI to RD (Alvarez)1-11-23
Date: January 12, 2023Sub of Atty of SBJLGI to RD (Lyng)1-11-23
Date: January 12, 2023Sub of Atty of SBJLGI to RD (Alvarez)1-12-23
Date: January 12, 2023Sub of Atty of SBJLGI to RD (Lyng)1-12-23
Date: January 12, 20232023.04.13 Loeb's Sub of Atty
Date: April 13, 20232023.04.13 Def's Notice of E-Service Addys
Date: April 13, 2023(Munger) Notice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens
Date: June 13, 2023(Munger) RFD
Date: June 15, 20232023.06.29 Notice of Related Case 22CV00157
Date: June 29, 20232023.07.28 Notice of Assignment of App Case Number
Date: July 28, 2023Stip to Stay Proceedings and Order 7-27-23
Date: August 10, 2023NOE re Stipulation 8.30.23
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOE re Stipulation 8.30.23 | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order Party: Cross Defendant ALVAREZ, DANIEL ALFONSO; Cross Defendant DAVID LYNG & ASSOCIATES, INC. |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Party: Attorney Cavitch, Matthew P; Attorney Dibennedetto, Anna; Attorney Jones, Shannon; Claimant Finger, David; Claimant Finger, Sylvia Wikler; Cross Complainant Loeb, Mary; Cross Defendant ALVAREZ, DANIEL ALFONSO; Cross Defendant DAVID LYNG & ASSOCIATES, INC. |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Stip to Stay Proceedings and Order 7-27-23 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order/Judgment Received Party: Cross Defendant ALVAREZ, DANIEL ALFONSO; Cross Defendant DAVID LYNG & ASSOCIATES, INC. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.07.28 Notice of Assignment of App Case Number | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Claimant Finger, David; Claimant Finger, Sylvia Wikler |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.06.29 Notice of Related Case 22CV00157 | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.