Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
David Durham, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against James A. Petralia, Private Capital Group, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2022 |
CategoryPetition Re:Arbitration Award Unlimited (11) |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
This complaint is a memorandum in support of a petition to confirm an arbitration award. The petitioners, David Durham individually and as Trustee of the David Durham Survivor's Trust and Trustee of the Martina Durham Bypass Trust, are requesting the...
Confirm-Amended Notice of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: January 11, 2022Durham-Proof of Service on James Petralia
Date: January 26, 2022Proof of Service on Private Capital Group
Date: January 28, 2022Request for Dismissal-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (01534864)
Date: February 25, 2022Confirm-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: January 10, 2022Confirm-Memorandum in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: January 10, 2022Confirm-Notice of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: January 10, 2022Confirm-Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (01534864) | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Private Capital Group | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Durham-Proof of Service on James Petralia | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Confirm-Amended Notice of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.