Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mcgee, Amber Sky Espuivel, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Saez, Martha, Tolbert, Carlton Ray, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts Superior with McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCabe, Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
Category(23): Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Judge: MacLaren, Peter |
|
November 09, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV-03209 Amber Mcgee v. Carlton Tolbert, et al. Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Appearance required. Remote appearances are strongly encouraged. To arrange a remote appearance, contact the clerk o... | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Motion Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV-03209 Amber McGee v. Carlton Tolbert, et al. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel The unopposed motion to be relieved as counsel filed on July 6, 2023, by attorney Alivia Abreu, Esq. / Wilshire Law F... | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
HRG 10/2/23 Notice of Remote Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.