Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jeff, Leonard Lee, represented by Gilbert, Marianne Caprice, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Reinhart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2022 |
CategoryCommunity Supervision Revocation |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
P/S re: Violation of Post Release Community Supervision
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PTC Re: Violation of Post Release Community Supervision
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Contested Violation of Post Release Comm. Sup.
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Probation Officer's Report | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PTC Re: Violation of Post Release Community Supervision
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
PTC Re: Violation of Post Release Community Supervision
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.