Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) case against Gonzalez, Robert Joel, represented by Ramirez, Jared Ross, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Randy L. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Prefile Arraignment / Continued Arraignment
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings (Pre) Re:
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support for a Warrant of Arrest | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DUI with Priors |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.