Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts with Berglund, John R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBerglund, John R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2022 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Berglund, John R |
|
June 29, 2022 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Berglund, John R |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter re: Ex Parte Communication | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.