Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Havarti Brie, Jung James, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cruz Joseph, Novatt Jeff Mitchell, against Carter Samson, Cater Samson, Cater Tiffany, Gant Roshima, Hankins Willie D, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Randy Rhodes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Default entered as to unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by James Jung on
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Roshima Gant (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Samson Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Roshima Gant (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Tiffany Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff); As to: Willie D Hankins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Samson Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Roshima Gant (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Samson Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Tiffany Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Tiffany Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff); As to: Willie D Hankins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Willie D Hankins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Roshima Gant (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Samson Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Tiffany Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Willie D Hankins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Updated -- Answer: Filed By: Samson Carter (Defendant); Result: Stricken; Result Date:
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff); As to: Willie D Hankins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Brie Havarti (Plaintiff); As to: Blue Manchego (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Updated -- Answer: Filed By: Willie D Hankins (Defendant); Result: Stricken; Result Date:
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brie Havarti (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 257.50
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Updated -- Answer: Filed By: Tiffany Cater (Defendant); Result: Stricken; Result Date:
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Updated -- Answer: Filed By: Roshima Gant (Defendant); Result: Stricken; Result Date:
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 10, 2023Default entered as to Willie D Hankins; On the Complaint filed by James Jung on
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 03, 2022Complaint
Date: January 03, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 03, 2022Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)
Date: January 03, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 03, 2022Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 19, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 19, 2022Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: January 19, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: January 28, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 28, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION RE EX PARTE NOTICE
Date: January 31, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CMC
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION SHORTENING TIME AND TO ADVANC...)
Date: February 01, 2022Answer
Date: February 15, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 16, 2022Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: February 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: February 22, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CMC
Date: March 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 07, 2022Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: April 13, 2022Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE
Date: April 14, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 14, 2022Writ of Execution - WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: April 18, 2022Application for Writ of Possession
Date: April 18, 2022Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: April 18, 2022Writ - Return
Date: July 13, 2022Status Report
Date: June 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: July 13, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: September 22, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: October 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 01, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 08, 2023Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Willie D Hankins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Samson Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Writ of Possession of Real Property Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Willie D Hankins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice (of CMC) Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Shortening Time and To Advanc...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Tiffany Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Roshima Gant (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Roshima Gant (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession Filed by Roshima Gant (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession Filed by Tiffany Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Tiffany Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Willie D Hankins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Brie Havarti (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Samson Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Samson Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by Tiffany Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Willie D Hankins)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of CMC) Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession Filed by Samson Cater (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Brie Havarti (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Declaration (Re Ex Parte Notice) Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Status Report Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by James Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Roshima Gant (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Supplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Willie D Hankins))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Shortening Time and To Advance the Hearing of the Demurrer)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice (of CMC)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (Re Ex Parte Notice)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 02/22/2022)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Shortening Time and To Advanc...))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.