Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Boone, Michael G., filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2022 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person Sharon Boone |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition - Probate Petition for Letters of Administration and Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Declaration of Publication |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Petition to Administer Estate | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities (Estates) | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Probate (Initial) Petition for Letters of Administration and Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.