Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stokes, Teresa Kiara Delilah, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a petition for a change of name, recognition of a change of gender, and issuance of a new birth certificate. The petitioner, Teresa Kiara Delilah Stokes, is requesting that the court change their name to Tahir James Stokes to confor...
Civil case cover sheet
Date: June 30, 2022Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed
Date: July 01, 2022Name Change OSC Filed
Date: July 01, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: June 30, 2022Petition for name change filed
Date: June 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept:404 Order for:Decree changing Name and Gender |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Petition For Name Change and Fee Waiver was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 7/19/2022 . Parties served: Teresa Kiara Delilah Stokes |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/1/2022 Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed by clerk |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/1/2022 Name Change OSC Filed Name Change OSC Filed Pending Six Week Hold |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/30/2022 Civil case cover sheet Civil case cover sheet |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/30/2022 Order Received for Signature Order Received for Signature Decree Changing Name and Gender Pending Six Week Hold |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/30/2022 Petition for name change filed Petition for name change filed & Gender Change |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.