Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stanford, Katalina, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2022 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a petition for a change of name, recognition of a change of gender, and issuance of a new birth certificate. The petitioner is requesting that their name be changed to "Suhfi Y B i Xg V" to conform to their gender identity. They are...
Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed
Date: June 24, 2022Name Change OSC Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Petition for name change filed
Date: June 23, 2022Civil case cover sheet
Date: June 23, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: June 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept:404 Order for:Decree Name and Gender Changer |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Spoke with party, got good address, mailing back with MC-040 |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/24/2022 Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/24/2022 Name Change OSC Filed Name Change OSC Filed Pending Six Week Hold |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/23/2022 Petition for name change filed Petition for name change filed & Gender Change |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/23/2022 Civil case cover sheet Civil case cover sheet |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/24/2022 Order Received for Signature Order Received for Signature Decree Changing Name Pending Six Week Hold |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.