Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Veniegas, Lydia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ramirez, Carlos Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Culver Kapetan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2022 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Lydia Veniegas against Carlos Ramirez and Does 1 to 25. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, specifically Carlos Ramirez, who violated Vehicle Code sections 23103(A) and 223...
Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 29, 2022Civil case cover sheet
Date: March 29, 2022Summons issued and filed
Date: March 29, 2022Proof of Service
Date: May 31, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 19, 2022Application Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Proof of Service
Date: July 27, 2022Application Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: July 27, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: September 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 12, 2022Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted
Date: December 21, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: July 07, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 13, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 13, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: July 07, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 07, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 14, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 10, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: January 11, 2023Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: December 21, 2022Order Granted
Date: January 10, 2023Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Whalen, Robert |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) & Cm |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Strike Filed 7/7/22 - Marla Garcia (cont. from 12/21/22) Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
January 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Lydia Veniegas v. Carlos Ramirez Superior Court Case No. 22CECG00945 Hearing Date: January 25, 2023 (Dept. 502) Motion: By Defendant Carlos Ramirez to Strike Portions of the Complaint Tentative Ru... | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed Case Management Statement (Statements) |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Department change only - from 403 to 502. |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
1-11-23 Declaration Re: Meet and Confer Efforts ISO Defendant's Motion to Strike-HRG 1/25/23 Declaration Filed Declaration Regarding Meet and Confer Efforts In Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) & CM |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granted Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael David Myers Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.