Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Briscoe, James, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Barrero, Gerardo Olmeda, G6 Hospitality, Llc, Nsr Hotels, Rasna, Llc, Sarvaiya, Himanshu, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, James Briscoe, is suing multiple defendants, including Veer Hospitality, LLC; NSR Hotels; Rasna, LLC; Himanshu Sarvaiya; Jenita Sarvaiya; and Duante Hall. T...
Notice of Hearing
Date: January 10, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: March 24, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 24, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: March 24, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Civil Complaint filed
Date: January 06, 2022Summons issued and filed
Date: January 10, 2022Civil case cover sheet
Date: January 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: James Briscoe v. Veer Hospitality, LLC Superior Court Case No. 22CECG00066 Hearing Date: May 23, 2023 (Dept. 502) Motion: By Defendants to Strike Punitive Damages Tentative Ruling: To deny. Defend... | |
October 27, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: James Briscoe v. Veer Hospitality, LLC Superior Court Case No. 22CECG00066 Hearing Date: October 27, 2022 (Dept. 403) Motion: Defendants’ Demurrer to the Complaint and Motion to Strike portions of... | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed 3/24/22 ~ Jennifer McCormick Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Strike Filed 3/24/22 ~ Jennifer McCormick Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
September 20, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: James Briscoe v. Veer Hospitality, LLC Superior Court Case No. 22CECG00066 Hearing Date: September 20, 2022 (Dept. 403) Motion: Demurrer and Motion to Strike by Defendants NSR Hotels, Rasna LLC, V... | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Quash Filed 3/24/22 - Service of Sumons - Jennifer McCormick (cont. from 4/21/22) Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
May 12, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: James Briscoe v. Veer Hospitality, LLC Superior Court Case No. 22CECG00066 Hearing Date: May 12, 2022 (Dept. 403) Motion: by defendant NSR Hotels to quash service of summons Tentative Ruling: To d... | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & Cm |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Quash Filed 3/24/22 ~ Service of Summons ~ Jennifer McCormick Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.