Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ware Katianna, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Lee Andre, against Castle Mary, Manager Doe, Walmart Inc., represented by Smith Andrew O, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Stephen Morgan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mary Castle (Defendant); As to: Katianna Ware (Plaintiff)
Date: August 23, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Katianna Ware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Walmart, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.