Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
North Interstate, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by North Interstate, Llc, against Callicott, Melanie Whitten, Callicott, Millard, represented by Callicott, Melanie Whitten, Callicott, Millard, in the jurisdiction of East Baton Rouge Parish, LA, . East Baton Rouge Parish, LA Superior Courts District with Judge:HIGGINBOTHAM, BEAU presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2023 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJune 05, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationEast Baton Rouge Parish, LA |
|
Filing Court HouseDistrict |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION NTC OF SEIZURE | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF WRIT | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Address Cover Page - BUTLER, STACY GROVE | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL -CV | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | REC FEE NTC OF SEIZURE | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | WRIT SEIZURE AND SALE-CIV 2175 - BUTLER, STACY GROVE | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Executory Process Signed by Commissioner Kina Kimble | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | DOC MINUTE - Judge: DOC MINUTE - Division: CHAMBER MIN | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT-CV | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PET- EXEC PROC-CIV - LOT 9; GLENMORE PLACE; $231,889.28 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.