Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Finau, Ateliana, Finau, Kamipeli, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Cara, Tony, against Alternative Loan Trust 2006-Oa1, Does 1-10, Inclusive, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, New Rez, Llc, Series 2006-Oa1, (total of 7) See All represented by Scott, Jason, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2022 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
68559Compl00b3b7
Date: December 30, 202268559Decla0337c8
Date: December 30, 202268559Civil02c23b
Date: December 30, 202268559Summo01c0b1
Date: December 30, 2022Complaint
Date: December 30, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 30, 2022Declaration
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 30, 202268752Proof012a2b
Date: January 05, 202368752Proof008739
Date: January 05, 202370863Amend0099ab
Date: February 14, 2023246187CMC20230414-2-1kywdx
Date: April 14, 202374170CaseM00ba6b
Date: April 17, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: January 04, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: January 04, 2023CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: April 17, 2023Joint Case Management Statement
Date: April 14, 2023First Amended Complaint
Date: February 14, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: April 17, 2023246749RJN20230502-2-1lwww80
Date: May 02, 2023246749Demurrer20230502-2-1sao4lk
Date: May 02, 2023246749POS20230502-2-1sfiej4
Date: May 02, 2023246749Declaration20230502-2-1iz0ckg
Date: May 02, 202376554Decla00881e
Date: May 30, 2023Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 02, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 30, 202324800120230606-2-jt56se
Date: June 06, 2023Demurrer and First Appearance Fee to
Date: May 02, 2023248477PROPO20230620-2-an35x1
Date: June 20, 2023248477POS20230620-2-nq6y2g
Date: June 20, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 20, 2023Declaration in Reply
Date: June 06, 2023Hearing on Demurrer
Date: June 13, 202378035Amend000e42
Date: June 27, 2023Second Amended Complaint
Date: June 27, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 28, 2023Order
Date: June 28, 202379443Reque00cf28
Date: July 24, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 79443Reque00cf28 | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer. | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Affidavit of Mailing ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - SIGNED BY JUDGE HEALY ON 6/27/2023 Order ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - SIGNED BY JUDGE HEALY ON 6/27/2023 |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 78035Amend000e42 | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Second Amended Complaint | |
June 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
ATELIANA FINAU, ET AL. VS. NEW REZ, LLC, ET AL. ATELIANA FINAU TONY CARA NEW REZ, LLC JASON SCOTT DEFENDANTS’ DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TENTATIVE RULING: Defendants New Rez, LLC and The Bank...
Judge: HONORABLE NICOLE S. HEALY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.