Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Adakite 1031, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Cohen, Brian S, against Alvarado, Eli Eloy Vasquez, American Contractors Indemnity Company, American Contractors Indemnity Company, A California Corporation, Arborco Tree Care, Arbor Co Tree Care, A California Corporation, (total of 24) See All represented by Lepera, Joseph A, Mason, Susan L, Mittelman, Mark R, Rible, Charles H., Woo, Amber N., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Halperin, Ernst presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by ADAKITE 1031, LLC against RG DEVELOPMENTS, GREG GAMBRIOLI, ARBOR CO TREE CARE, GILBERT WOLCOTT, WOLCOTT GILBERT LLC, and DOES 1-10. The complaint alleges three causes of action: trespass, trespass to timber, and intentional...
96682Decla01a728
Date: April 24, 202496682Decla00dbe0
Date: April 24, 202496680Memor0257ea
Date: April 24, 202496680Motio007503
Date: April 24, 202496680Proof04d6de
Date: April 24, 202496680Separ014669
Date: April 24, 202496680Propo034eb9
Date: April 24, 2024Request for Entry of Default Not Entered
Date: December 02, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: February 10, 2023Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order
Date: February 10, 2023Affidavit
Date: January 19, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order
Date: February 10, 2023First Amended Complaint
Date: January 23, 2023Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 27, 2022Complaint
Date: September 12, 2022Association of Counsel / Attorney
Date: January 18, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: December 01, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: September 13, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 06, 2022Amendment to Complaint
Date: September 28, 2022Amendment to Complaint
Date: November 15, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: February 10, 2023Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 02, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: October 03, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 27, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: January 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 12, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 26, 2022Request to Enter Default
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 29, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: December 19, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 01, 202296684Decla00cc8d
Date: April 24, 202496682Decla02f819
Date: April 24, 2024Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order
Date: February 10, 2023Amendment to Complaint
Date: November 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 15, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 11, 2023Informal Discovery Conference
Date: July 06, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 20, 2023Stipulation & Order
Date: June 14, 2023Answer
Date: June 27, 2023Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: June 12, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: June 12, 2023Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 09, 2023Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: May 30, 2023Amendment to Complaint
Date: May 12, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: February 10, 2023Answer
Date: February 27, 2023Summons Issued / Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 30, 2022Amendment to Complaint
Date: May 12, 2023Amendment to Complaint
Date: May 12, 2023Amendment to Complaint
Date: March 21, 2023Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 16, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: February 10, 2023Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: January 19, 2023Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 01, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: November 22, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: May 11, 2023Informal Discovery Conference
Date: April 17, 2023Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: April 03, 2023Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: March 09, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: February 10, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: December 29, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 26, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 01, 2023Cross Complaint
Date: February 16, 2023Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: May 30, 2023Amendment to Complaint
Date: May 12, 2023Amendment to Complaint
Date: May 12, 2023Answer
Date: March 22, 2023Answer
Date: February 21, 2023Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: January 19, 202396071Amend00cbb3
Date: April 16, 202495971Decla006d3d
Date: April 15, 202495968Decla00f7af
Date: April 15, 202495922Proof03ee8b
Date: April 15, 202495922Propo02f7dc
Date: April 15, 202495922Memor01d6fc
Date: April 15, 202495922MOTIO0073db
Date: April 15, 202495808CaseM006ea3
Date: April 11, 202493286State00b1da
Date: March 05, 2024Not Chg Add re Wolcott
Date: February 14, 2024Arbor Co_Notice of Change of Address 24-0108
Date: January 09, 202400283274
Date: September 12, 202200283275
Date: September 12, 202200283276
Date: September 12, 202200284463
Date: September 26, 202200284460
Date: September 26, 202200284462
Date: September 26, 202200284460
Date: September 27, 202200284493
Date: September 27, 202200284462
Date: September 27, 202200284463
Date: September 27, 202200284592
Date: September 28, 202200284870
Date: October 03, 202200288530
Date: November 16, 202266814Proof00a02a
Date: November 22, 202200288533
Date: November 28, 2022General Denial re Gambrioli Devl
Date: December 01, 2022General Denial re Greg Gambrioli
Date: December 01, 2022General Denial re Wolcott
Date: December 01, 202267182Proof000a9c
Date: December 01, 202200289422
Date: December 02, 202200289421
Date: December 02, 202200289605
Date: December 06, 202200289603
Date: December 06, 202200290206
Date: December 15, 202200290397
Date: December 19, 2022Gambrioli CMC Statement
Date: December 29, 202200292331
Date: January 13, 2023PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO
Date: January 13, 202369457Assoc00e012
Date: January 18, 202369537Subst0043e3
Date: January 19, 202369537Subst016c9f
Date: January 19, 202300293056
Date: January 23, 20232023.02.10. Ds MPO re RFA Set 1
Date: February 11, 20232023.02.10. Ds Prop O iso MPO re RFA Set 1
Date: February 11, 20232023.02.10. Ds MPO re RFP Set 1
Date: February 11, 20232023.02.10. Ds MPO re SROGS Set 1
Date: February 11, 20232023.02.10. Ds Prop O iso MPO re RFP Set 1
Date: February 11, 20232023.02.10. Ds MTS Portions of P Adakite FAC
Date: February 11, 20232023.02.10. Ds Prop O iso MTS P Adakite FAC
Date: February 11, 20232023.02.10. Ds Prop O iso MPO re SROGS Set 1
Date: February 11, 202371027Cross0233b6
Date: February 16, 202371027Answe00791f
Date: February 16, 202371027Summo01997e
Date: February 16, 202300296215
Date: February 17, 2023Arbor Co_Answer to FAC 23-0220
Date: February 20, 2023General Denial to 1st Amended Complaint
Date: February 28, 20232178453
Date: March 02, 2023Substitution of Attorneys
Date: March 09, 202372175Proof001817
Date: March 09, 202300298551
Date: March 21, 2023Arbor Co_Answer to XC 23-0322
Date: March 22, 202373477417230044f9
Date: April 04, 202373477DEFEN017469
Date: April 04, 202374675Reque0087eb
Date: April 25, 2023Arbor Co_Eli Vasquez_Answer to FAC 23-0509
Date: May 09, 202300302666
Date: May 12, 202300302667
Date: May 12, 202300302665
Date: May 12, 202300302664
Date: May 12, 202300302663
Date: May 12, 202376515Proof01c5e9
Date: May 30, 202376515Proof009efd
Date: May 30, 2023Vasquez_BAIC_Stip to Set Aside Default 23-0607
Date: June 08, 202377230Proof00d2eb
Date: June 12, 202377230Proof011e45
Date: June 12, 202377230Proof02dc06
Date: June 12, 2023Vasquez_BAIC_Stip to Set Aside Default 23-0613
Date: June 14, 2023PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-JUDGMENT SENT TO
Date: June 14, 2023Arbor Co_Elmer Vasquez Answer to XC 23-0627
Date: June 27, 2023General Denial
Date: July 19, 2023Reply to Oppo MTS FAC (A6255641xDBB43)
Date: August 05, 2023Order on Motion to Strike (Lo S.-2)
Date: August 16, 2023Case Management Statement -9.5.2023
Date: September 05, 2023Arbor Co_CMC Stmnt 23-0912
Date: September 12, 20232023.09.13 Defs. CMC. 9.28.23
Date: September 13, 2023Case Management Stmt
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
October 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order FOR FINANCIAL DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 3295 Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Informal Discovery Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96682Decla01a728 | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96682Decla00dbe0 | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96680Memor0257ea | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96680Motio007503 | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96680Proof04d6de | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96680Separ014669 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.