Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ryan, Colman, Ryan, Evelyn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fitting, Chantel L., against Butler, Linnea Theresa, Does 1 To 50, Martinsson, Susanne, represented by Morrison, Anders, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2022 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by plaintiffs Evelyn Ryan and Colman Ryan against defendants Susanne Martinsson and Does 1 to 50. The plaintiffs allege negligence on the part of the defendants, spec...
59847Civil02f21a
Date: July 01, 202259847Compl003f9a
Date: July 01, 202259847Summo01cbaa
Date: July 01, 202262750Proof00f079
Date: August 30, 202262750Proof01a907
Date: August 30, 202264142ANSWE00f245
Date: September 29, 202264142CaseM01b91d
Date: September 29, 202264142DEMAN02e679
Date: September 29, 202265725Deman000d81
Date: October 31, 202265891Stipu00800b
Date: November 03, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: July 01, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 01, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 29, 2022Demand For Jury Trial
Date: September 29, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 29, 2022PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC SENT TO
Date: November 03, 2022Demand For Jury Trial
Date: October 31, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: July 01, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: August 30, 2022CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.
Date: October 17, 2022Complaint
Date: July 01, 202270971Amend00fa67
Date: February 15, 2023Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 08, 2022Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: February 16, 2023CMC - At issue - Referred to ADR Stip already filed
Date: November 08, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: February 16, 202372429Notic00c8b3
Date: March 15, 2023Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: March 15, 202374011Reque0059cc
Date: April 13, 2023Request For Dismissal
Date: April 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | 74011Reque0059cc | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Return from Conditional Settlement | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 72429Notic00c8b3 | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY'S BY CLERK ANTHONY BERINI Stipulation and Order to ADR COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY'S BY CLERK ANTHONY BERINI Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance Until 4/30/23 as mediation is set for 3/9/23- beyond the original deadline. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.