Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ross, Barry, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Shore, James A, against Does 1 - 100, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Swope, V. Raymond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSwope, V. Raymond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2022 |
Category(13) Unlimited Defamation |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Barry Ross against Defendants Does 1-100. The complaint alleges three causes of action: libel and defamation, unlawful business practice pursuant to Business and Profession Code §17200, and false personation and c...
Ross-RFD 11.15.22
Date: November 15, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: May 25, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 25, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: May 25, 2022Complaint
Date: May 25, 2022Order Denying
Date: August 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Ross-RFD 11.15.22 | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying RE PLAINTIFF BARRY ROSS' EX PARTE APPLICATION Order Denying RE PLAINTIFF BARRY ROSS' EX PARTE APPLICATION |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Fee Paid | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Fee Paid | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1, 2020) Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.