Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ellis, Patricia, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited Class Action case represented by Treglio, James M, against Citibank, N.A., Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, represented by Potter, Mark, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Swope, V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2022 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited Class Action |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action complaint filed by Patricia Ellis on behalf of herself and others similarly situated. The complaint is against Citibank, N.A. and up to 100 unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges several violations, including failu...
53027Compl00b022
Date: February 04, 202253027Civil01e8b9
Date: February 04, 202253027Summo02bb77
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: February 04, 2022Complaint
Date: February 04, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 04, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: February 04, 2022POS_Citibank NA
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Change of Address Ellis
Date: March 28, 2022Prop Order re Stip to Dismiss Non-PAGA
Date: April 13, 2022Stip to Dismiss non-PAGA and Stay PAGA Claim
Date: April 13, 2022Prop Order re Stip to Dismiss Non-PAGA
Date: April 14, 2022Stip to Dismiss non-PAGA and Stay PAGA Claim
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 28, 2023Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: March 28, 2022Proof of Service by
Date: March 07, 2022Order
Date: April 26, 2022Stipulation
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: April 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability of Counsel JAMES M. TREGLIO WILL BE UNAVAILABLE FROM AUGUST 3, 2023 THROUGH Notice of Unavailability of Counsel JAMES M. TREGLIO WILL BE UNAVAILABLE FROM AUGUST 3, 2023 THROUGH AUGUST 7, 2023 |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Type: DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S NON-PAGA INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS FOR SUBMISSION TO AR Order Type: DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S NON-PAGA INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS FOR SUBMISSION TO ARBITRATION, DISMISSING CLASS ALLEGATIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND STAYING PAGA CLAIM Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 4/25/22 |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Prop Order re Stip to Dismiss Non-PAGA | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Stip to Dismiss non-PAGA and Stay PAGA Claim | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation TO DISMISS OR STAY NON-PAGA INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS FOR SUBMISSION TO ARBITRATION, TO DISMISS Stipulation TO DISMISS OR STAY NON-PAGA INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS FOR SUBMISSION TO ARBITRATION, TO DISMISS CLASS ALLEGATIONS, AND TO STAY PAGA CLAIM |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Prop Order re Stip to Dismiss Non-PAGA | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Stip to Dismiss non-PAGA and Stay PAGA Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.