Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Quintero, Adriana J., Stone, Jessica L, Stone, Leonard W, Iii, filed a(n) (16) Unlimited Fraud case represented by Ring, Bart I, against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Stake, Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiffs Title, Or Any Cloud On Plaintiffs' Title To That Property, Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Steven A Weinkauf, Trustee Of The Steven A Weinkauf Irrevocable Living Trust, Stone, Jessica L, Stone, Leonard W, Iii, (total of 6) See All represented by Long, Scott D, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2022 |
Category(16) Unlimited Fraud |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
94530DEFEN005b96
Date: March 23, 2024Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 13, 2023Pretrial Order
Date: February 13, 2024Affidavit of Mailing
Date: February 13, 2024Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: February 13, 2024Complaint
Date: January 24, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 28, 2023Request for Entry of Default Not Entered
Date: March 15, 2023Cross Complaint
Date: March 08, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 08, 2022Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: March 09, 2022Order Denying
Date: December 22, 2022Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: August 15, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: May 23, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: February 22, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: March 09, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: December 23, 2022Declaration
Date: December 12, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: December 05, 2022Application
Date: December 16, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: December 05, 2022Request to Enter Default
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: August 12, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 15, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 06, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 14, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 14, 2022Amended Proof of Service by
Date: June 22, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 28, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: January 25, 2022Proof of Service by FAX of
Date: July 14, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 12, 2022Notice of Lien
Date: July 14, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: May 11, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2022Declaration of Due Diligence
Date: April 29, 2022Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)
Date: January 31, 2022jury_fees_2_
Date: February 13, 2024cmc_quintero
Date: February 02, 2024summons_FINAL
Date: January 22, 2022verified_final
Date: January 22, 2022civilcasecover_final
Date: January 22, 2022notice_of_recordation
Date: February 01, 202254435DEFEN01e1b2
Date: March 08, 202254435DEFEN00bf73
Date: March 08, 202254509Summo005940
Date: March 09, 2022cmcstatement
Date: April 28, 2022notice_cmc
Date: April 28, 202256977Affid00b604
Date: April 29, 202257305CaseM007298
Date: May 06, 202258063PROOF001020
Date: May 24, 202258063PROOF012a90
Date: May 24, 202259400Amend01f30a
Date: June 22, 202259408Reque00e814
Date: June 22, 202259400Amend007cf0
Date: June 22, 202259408Reque012704
Date: June 22, 20222022.07.12_POS by Fax.SIgned
Date: July 14, 20222022.07.07_Notice of Lien_Signed
Date: July 14, 20222022.07.12_POES.Notice of Lien.Signed
Date: July 14, 20222020.07.14_POS by Mail.Signed
Date: July 14, 202289034DEFEN00c772
Date: December 27, 202361903Notic01a463
Date: August 12, 202261903CaseM00ab01
Date: August 12, 2022Quintero.MC-040.Signed w POS
Date: September 01, 202266363CaseM00e0dd
Date: November 14, 2022order
Date: December 09, 2022decOSC
Date: December 09, 2022app
Date: December 09, 2022app
Date: December 12, 2022order
Date: December 12, 2022decOSC
Date: December 12, 2022app
Date: December 16, 2022order
Date: December 16, 202271142LEONA00ad3f
Date: February 18, 2023cmc
Date: February 22, 2023pos
Date: February 22, 202371302CaseM008ef2
Date: February 22, 2023rfd
Date: March 15, 2023rfd_quintero
Date: May 06, 202376702CaseM00432a
Date: June 01, 202380645Stipu004939
Date: August 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
December 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 7 DAY EST Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
November 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
November 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference IN-PERSON Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
March 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 94530DEFEN005b96 | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Pretrial Order | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing PRETRIAL ORDER Affidavit of Mailing PRETRIAL ORDER |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 02/13/2024 Case Management and Trial Setting Conference Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Jury Trial | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.