Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Zweifler, Marita, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cai, James, against Azaroff, Tara, Does 1-10, Inclusive, Egan, Ernest, Egan, Gioconda-Maria, E Ventures, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, (total of 7) See All represented by Wintle, Roger D, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges various claims including breach of contract, breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing, unjust enrichment, security fraud, rescission, fraudulent transfer, common counts, fraud/misrepresentation, and conspiracy. The...
2024_sum200A
Date: April 18, 20242024_sum100_1_Amended
Date: April 18, 202422_CIV_00069_MOTION_to_E_ndants_from_the_case
Date: February 22, 2024Egan CMS
Date: February 05, 2024Summons Issued / Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: January 06, 2022Complaint
Date: January 06, 2022POS-3.18.22
Date: March 18, 2022Dismissal-Giaconda-Marita's (1)
Date: March 18, 2022Dismissal-Giaconda-Marita Z (1)
Date: April 27, 2022POS-4.27.22
Date: April 27, 2022Entry of Default-Marita- 4.27.22
Date: April 27, 2022Proof of Service 4.27.22
Date: April 27, 2022Entry of Default-MZ
Date: May 12, 2022Amended poss Ernest
Date: May 13, 2022Amended Poss E Ventures
Date: May 13, 2022Amended Poss Piggy
Date: May 13, 2022Entry of Default-MZ (1)
Date: May 16, 2022Proof of Service-MZ (1) (1)
Date: May 16, 2022Amended pos E Ventures
Date: May 16, 2022Amended Pos Piggy
Date: May 16, 2022mc053_flattened
Date: July 12, 2022POS-22.7.12
Date: July 12, 2022mc052-Marita_flattened
Date: July 12, 2022mc051-Marita (1)_flattened
Date: July 12, 2022POS-22.7.13
Date: July 13, 2022Egan P and A
Date: November 30, 2022Egan Propossed Order
Date: November 30, 2022Egan Declaration
Date: November 30, 2022Egan Motion and Notice of Motion
Date: November 30, 2022Egan Motion and Notice of Motion
Date: December 14, 2022Egan Declaration Z
Date: December 14, 2022Egan Propossed Order
Date: December 14, 2022Egan P and A-4
Date: December 14, 2022Change_of_Address_1
Date: April 04, 2023Proof_of_service
Date: April 04, 2023Egan Proposed Order Final
Date: April 20, 2023Egan Motion Final
Date: April 20, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: February 15, 2022Amended Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: February 28, 2022Amended Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: February 28, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: February 28, 2022Amended Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: May 16, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: April 25, 2022Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: April 27, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: March 02, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: April 25, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 27, 2022Amended Summons Issued / Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: May 16, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 16, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: July 12, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 27, 2022Request for Entry of Default Not Entered
Date: May 12, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved
Date: July 12, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: July 12, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 13, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 12, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 13, 2022Declaration
Date: December 13, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 22, 2022Amended Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: February 28, 2022Request for Entry of Default Not Entered
Date: April 27, 2022Request for Entry of Default Not Entered
Date: February 28, 2022Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: October 14, 2022PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: December 13, 2022Egan Cover Sheet Final
Date: April 25, 2023Egan Proof Amended Motion
Date: April 25, 2023Egan P and A and Declaration Proof
Date: April 25, 202322_CIV_00069_Plaintiff_s_ate_Default_Judgment
Date: May 09, 2023Egan Proposed Order
Date: August 02, 2023Egan Z Porposed Order Cover Sheet
Date: August 02, 2023Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment
Date: March 10, 2023Motion
Date: December 13, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: April 10, 2023Motion to Vacate
Date: June 30, 2023Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment
Date: June 02, 20232023_10_15_1_Sanction_Pl_sponseWithCoverSheet
Date: October 17, 20232023_10_17_Plaintiffs_Re_rder_to_Show_Cause_1
Date: October 18, 20232023_10_17_Case_22_CIV_0_t_Statement_Zweifler
Date: October 18, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_sum200A | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_sum100_1_Amended | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 22_CIV_00069_MOTION_to_E_ndants_from_the_case | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Egan CMS | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023_10_17_Plaintiffs_Re_rder_to_Show_Cause_1 | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023_10_17_Case_22_CIV_0_t_Statement_Zweifler | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023_10_15_1_Sanction_Pl_sponseWithCoverSheet | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Egan Proposed Order | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Egan Z Porposed Order Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.