Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Aposhian George, against Hovhannisyan Karlos, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Huey P. Cotton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: KARLOS HOVHANNISYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Declaration of Laura; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COST; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Vacate Default Judgment; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION O; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Default entered as to KARLOS HOVHANNISYAN; On the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. on
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Updated -- On the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 20, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 03, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION O
Date: August 13, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COST
Date: August 13, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 13, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 13, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/18/2021
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 18, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 07, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 30, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/30/2021
Date: September 30, 2021Default Judgment
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 01, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: April 11, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF NONAPPEARANCE
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF LAURA
Date: August 01, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 23, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 01, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT)
Date: September 20, 2022Order - ORDER MOTION TO VACATE/ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: September 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (DECLARATION RE:NONMILITARY STATUS)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 08/18/2021)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION O)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COST)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.