Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gomez Viviana, Gabra Peter, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: March 10, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of )
Date: January 28, 2022Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of )
Date: April 15, 2022Decree Changing Name
Date: April 15, 2022Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: April 15, 2022Proof of Publication
Date: April 04, 2022Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.