Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Villi, Alexander Viktor, represented by Hubbell, Marlene A, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Traffic Trial
Judge: Hardcastle, Virgil Wayne |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Skinner, Mark |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Received | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Sent | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Citation Courtesy Notice | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.