Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Zepeda, Gabriel Beas, represented by Seymour, Amanda L., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Traffic Trial
Judge: Skinner, Mark |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Skinner, Mark |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | General Time Waiver | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.