Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Figg Adam, Figg Dylan, Figg Emilienne, Figg Rachael, Punt Neil Thomas, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Burris Ariana Anderson, Hernandez Ricsie Anne M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael W. Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael W. Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Petition - Letters of Special Admin w/Gen Powers (Initial)
Date: October 26, 2021Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: October 26, 2021Creditor's Claim
Date: October 26, 2021Notice - Petition to Administer Estate
Date: October 27, 2021Declaration - Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver
Date: November 30, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: November 19, 2021Petition - Letters Special Admin w/Gen Powers (Subsequent)
Date: November 30, 2021Proof of Service - Proof of Service
Date: December 01, 2021Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB09566
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order
Date: January 06, 2022Status Report of Personal Representative
Date: February 21, 2023Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: March 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letters - Special Administrator Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding Status Report Hearing - Held Status Report Hearing - Held Judge: Uzcategui Jessica A. |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Status Report of Personal Representative filed on February 21, 2023 by Neil Thomas Punt. ) | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Estate Administration Extended | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Uzcategui Jessica A. |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.