Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Trope Roland L, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Yoshitake Alan Toshio, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Ana Maria Luna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: December 16, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 22, 2023Minute Order
Date: December 27, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 20, 2022Request - Special Notice
Date: November 19, 2021Response - TRUSTEE'S RESPONSE TO PETITION INTER VIVOS TRUST DATED FOR INSTRUCTIONS
Date: December 15, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: December 15, 2021Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037) - Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)
Date: March 03, 2022Objection - Objection
Date: March 03, 2022Joinder - Joinder to Opposition to Petition
Date: March 04, 2022Notice - Association of Counsel
Date: April 01, 2022Notice - Notice of Court Ordered Mediation
Date: July 22, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 04, 2022Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010
Date: July 28, 2022Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010
Date: July 29, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 01, 2022Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement
Date: December 21, 2022Objection - Trust Petition - Objection to Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement
Date: December 22, 2022Supplement - Second Supplement to Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement
Date: February 14, 2023Minute Order
Date: February 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Beneficiary |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Denied | |
February 22, 2023 | Minute Order | ||
February 22, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trust 17200 Hearing |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trustee |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Beneficiary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.