Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vanderbilt Scott, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Moritz Lauren Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel A. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice - Hearing
Date: May 18, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: June 10, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 29, 2021Supplement
Date: January 04, 2022Minute Order
Date: January 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Order (Order After Hearing Granting Petiiton for an Order Transferring Title to Property Belonging to the Trust Estate ) | |
March 02, 2022 | Order - Order After Hearing Granting Petiiton for an Order Transferring Title to Property Belonging to the Trust Estate | ||
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Juarez Daniel |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
January 07, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
January 07, 2022 | Hearing |
Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trust 17200 Hearing |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 04, 2022 | Supplement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.