Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Department Of Health Care Services, West Pauline, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Gaudy Jason Louis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Deborah L. Christian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order
Date: January 17, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 24, 2022Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: April 20, 2021Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)
Date: April 20, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: May 04, 2021Supplement - Verified Supplement To Petition
Date: May 20, 2021Minute Order
Date: May 24, 2021Order - Appointing Personal Representative
Date: May 25, 2021Bond - liberty mutual
Date: June 17, 2021Notice - Notice Franchise tax board
Date: July 06, 2021Notice - Notice of department of Health Care Services
Date: July 06, 2021Inventory & Appraisal - Final $875,000.00
Date: August 24, 2021Request - Special Notice (No Fee)
Date: September 29, 2021Creditor's Claim
Date: September 29, 2021Request - Special Notice (No Fee)
Date: October 04, 2021Petition - Terminate Proceedings
Date: November 02, 2022Notice - Hearing
Date: November 18, 2022Supplement - Supplement
Date: January 11, 2023Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal
Date: February 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order (Order Approving Petition for Termination of Proceedings ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal - Special Notice Filed by Claimant |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Authority Hearing (Non-Trust) - Held Authority Hearing (Non-Trust) - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing ( ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.