Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wolverton Claudia, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Miller Mark Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael W. Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael W. Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: September 09, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 07, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2022Order - Final Distribution
Date: December 28, 2022Declaration - of Claimant
Date: January 07, 2022PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected
Date: January 21, 2022Creditor's Claim - Creditors Claim
Date: February 04, 2022Inventory & Appraisal - supplemental $11,649.71
Date: May 11, 2022Notice - Hearing
Date: July 14, 2022Supplement - Supplement
Date: August 12, 2022Declaration - Declaration of attorney
Date: September 06, 2022Supplement - Supplement
Date: October 12, 2022Receipt - Receipt
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | TERM: Approval of Final Distribution | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 19, 2023 | Receipt - Receipt | ||
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Final Distribution | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Account - Final or Waiver filed on July 1, 2022 by Claudia Wolverton. ) | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Small Michael |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Supplement (Supplement ) | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.