Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gatt Michael, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Salvo Alice A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: June 29, 2021Supplement - First Supplement
Date: August 17, 2021Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Hearing
Date: August 20, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 20, 2021Bond - suretec
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Order - Order Granting Petition for Appointment of Successor Trustee (Probate Code 15643, 15660(d)) | ||
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (Order Granting Petition for Appointment of Successor Trustee (Probate Code 15643, 15660(d)) ) | |
September 01, 2021 | Bond - suretec | ||
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bond (suretec ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2021 | Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Hearing | ||
August 20, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Notice of Hearing ) Filed by Attorney |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.