Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sad Gregory L., filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Schomer Scott Peter, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael W. Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael W. Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 10, 2023Notice - Hearing
Date: June 16, 2021Supplement - First Verified Supplement
Date: June 16, 2021Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - Contest of Account
Date: August 09, 2021Consent - Consent to E Service
Date: August 09, 2021Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 11, 2021PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected
Date: August 12, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: September 02, 2021Nomination - Nomination for Forensic Accountant
Date: September 24, 2021Reply - Reply to objections to first account
Date: September 24, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document - Joint status report to the court
Date: January 19, 2022Order - Approving Account
Date: February 03, 2022Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order
Date: February 22, 2022Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling (Notices)
Date: February 23, 2022Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name/Address (Notices)
Date: November 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Accounting - Trust (Initial) filed on March 12, 2021 by Gregory L. Sad. ) | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Uzcategui Jessica A. |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Contestant |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (by Email ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Uzcategui Jessica A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.