Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jones Vanita, Williams Erica Lashae, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Riley Oliver Matthew, Zakari Andre, against Lloyd Darren Ahman, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael C. Small presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: December 16, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 13, 2023Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: February 19, 2021Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition
Date: June 25, 2021Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing 12.06.2021
Date: June 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 02, 2021170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge
Date: July 06, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 06, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 30, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 05, 2021Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2021Notice - Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: December 15, 2021Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing 06.16.2022
Date: May 11, 2022Notice - Settlement Conference - Notice - Settlement Conference 07.18.2022
Date: May 11, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 16, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing 08.19.22 Erica 17200
Date: June 20, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 19, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing 12.16.2022 Darren Petn
Date: August 26, 2022Notice - Settlement Conference - Notice - Settlement Conference 05.17.2023
Date: August 26, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing 12.16.2022 Erica petn
Date: August 26, 2022Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Date: February 07, 2023Ex Parte - Order
Date: February 09, 2023Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing 04.11.23
Date: March 03, 2023Minute Order
Date: April 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department MSC 250A, Wada, Robert S, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - Not Held - Court's Motion Mandatory Settlement Conference - Not Held - Court's Motion Judge: Wada Robert S |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MSC - Not Held - Settlement Prior to MSC | |
May 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department MSC 250A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Mandatory Settlement Conference |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (The Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) filed on by Petitioner(s) Darren Ahman Lloyd ) | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (The Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) filed on by Petitioner(s) Erica LaShae Williams ) | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Uzcategui Jessica A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.