Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vw Credit Inc. A Corporation Dba Vw Credit Leasing Ltd, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against California Department Of Motor Vehicles A California Governmental Agency, Harutyunyan Anahit, Janef Davoudi Dba J And D Auto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Katherine Chilton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: VW Credit Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 18, 2022Order for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by:
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Default entered as to Davoudi Janef; On the Complaint filed by VW Credit Inc., a corporation on
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: VW Credit Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by:
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: August 19, 2021Complaint - Complaint
Date: August 19, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 30, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: January 25, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 07, 2022Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: March 07, 2022Brief (name extension) - Brief SUMMARY OF CASE RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: April 20, 2022Judgment - Judgment
Date: June 15, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]
Date: June 15, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: July 18, 2022Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession
Date: July 22, 2022Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: February 07, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: VW Credit Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.