Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ivie Stanley Robert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sandler Bradley Stephen, against Ivie Ilhame Bounouhi, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elizabeth A. Grimes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order | ||
January 12, 2023 | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | ||
January 12, 2023 | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | ||
January 04, 2023 | Ex Parte - Application to Restore Former Name | ||
December 20, 2022 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
December 20, 2022 | Judgment | ||
December 14, 2022 | Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers | ||
December 14, 2022 | Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | ||
December 14, 2022 | Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170 | ||
November 21, 2022 | Notice - Change of Address - Notice - Change of Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.