Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Balcazar Ricardo, Gt'S Living Kefirs Llc, Zewengel Raiel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Farid Mahsa Danny, Geoulla Daniel Danny, against Balcazar Ricardo, Deleon Bravo Segundo S., District Blvd Llc, Gt'S Living Foods Llc, Gt'S Living Kefirs Llc, (total of 13) See All represented by Grandy Allison L., Hengesbach Scott L., Vasquez Oliver J., Pasarow Stephen Charles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Raiel Zewengel against multiple defendants. The defendants named in the complaint include GT's Living Foods, LLC; GT's Living Kefirs, LLC; District Blvd, LLC; Pens...
Complaint
Date: December 09, 2021Answer; Filed by: Christian Jonathan Mejia (Defendant); As to: Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Christian Jonathan Mejia (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00; Default not entered as to District Blvd, LLC; On the Complaint filed by Raiel Zewengel on
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Hampton Properties (Defendant); As to: Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Christian Jonathan Mejia (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. (Defendant); As to: Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Segundo S. Deleon Bravo (Defendant); As to: Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Segundo S. Deleon Bravo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 09, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2021Complaint
Date: December 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 09, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: December 10, 2021PI General Order
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: April 06, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 03, 2022Answer
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 03, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: May 04, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 09, 2022Answer
Date: May 09, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 09, 2022Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address
Date: May 09, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 29, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 23, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 23, 2023Separate Statement
Date: February 23, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Segundo S. Deleon Bravo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Segundo S. Deleon Bravo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Raiel Zewengel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.