Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sciberras Joseph Paul James, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Campbell Jessica, Haque Kashif, Wong Samuel Alan, Carlsen Ali S., Harvey Christopher, (total of 5) See All against California Fine Wine & Spirits Llc, represented by Leach Douglas R., Mckelvey Brandon R., Nelson Timothy Blair, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: California Fine Wine & Spirits, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Joint Statement Re Viking River; Filed by: Joseph Paul James Sciberras (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 13, 2023Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joseph Paul James Sciberras (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Newly Filed Class Action))
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Defendant California Fine Wine & Spirits LLC's Notice of Appearance
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Statement
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.