Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bandeklinares Magda, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Sweeney Brandon J, against Gimj Investment Group Iii Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: November 04, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 04, 2021Complaint
Date: November 04, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)
Date: November 23, 2021Initial Status Conference Order
Date: November 23, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: December 02, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Newly Filed Class Action)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Magda Bandeklinares (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Magda Bandeklinares (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Magda Bandeklinares (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Magda Bandeklinares (Plaintiff); As to: GIMJ Investment Group III, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Magda Bandeklinares (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.