Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Santana Gustavo, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cara Anthony Paul, against Affinia Default Services Llc, Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, U.S. Bank National Association As Trustee For Terwin Mortgage Trust 2004-451. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-4Sl, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 23, 2021Complaint
Date: September 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 27, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE OF REMOVAL
Date: October 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Gustavo Santana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Gustavo Santana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Gustavo Santana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Gustavo Santana (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 27, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court (NOTICE OF REMOVAL)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: January 27, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.