Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Doe An Individual Jane, Doe Jane, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Tauler Robert, against Unruly Agency Llc., Unruly Agency Llc A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Jaafari Armand J., Pitt Damon M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Burdge, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant); As to: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Motion to Seal Contract; Filed by: Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel Robert Tauler re Arbitration; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: Jane Doe, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Declaration of Caitlin C. Blanche; Filed by: Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 07, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]
Date: September 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL CONTRACT
Date: September 23, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAITLIN C. BLANCHE
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: October 08, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 04, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/04/2022
Date: February 04, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 03, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT UNRULY AGENCY LLCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 29, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 04, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Caitlin C. Blanche) Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Continuance of Case Management Conference) Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Hearing on Motion to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Contract) Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re status of commencement of the arbi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Unruly Agency LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Hearing on Motion to...))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Caitlin C. Blanche)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference])
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Contract)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Opposition and Declaration Conditionally Filed Under Seal)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Caitlin C. Blanche)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Contract)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/04/2022)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference])
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT UNRULY AGENCY LLCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Opposition and Declaration Conditionally Filed Under Seal)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.