Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garcia Orlando, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Lockhart Amanda Richards, against Farmer Christy A., Farmer George T., represented by Cairns Jack Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Maurice A. Leiter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Answer; Filed by: George T. Farmer (Defendant); As to: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: November 17, 2021Answer
Date: November 17, 2021Complaint
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 23, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 24, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 08, 2021Answer
Date: September 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 05, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 08, 2021Status Conference Statement
Date: December 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION RELATED ACCESSIBILI...)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: April 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: April 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: May 18, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 26, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 05, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 18, 2022Separate Statement
Date: November 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 23, 2022Separate Statement
Date: November 23, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 23, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 17, 2023Separate Statement
Date: January 26, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Response - RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF FACTS
Date: January 31, 2023Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 31, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY
Date: February 08, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 21, 2023Trial Brief
Date: February 24, 2023Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT
Date: February 24, 2023Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT
Date: February 24, 2023Reply - REPLY SUPPORT MOTION IN LIMINE #1
Date: February 27, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF TEHNIAT ZAMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO1
Date: February 27, 2023Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: February 27, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF J. THOMAS CAIRNS, JR. IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: February 28, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 03, 2023Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: March 08, 2023Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL NOTICE AND MOTION
Date: March 16, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: George T. Farmer (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Christy A. Farmer (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Christy A. Farmer (Defendant); As to: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher A. Seabock regarding meet and confer; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Christy A. Farmer (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Response to Statement of Facts; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher A. Seabock regarding meet and confer) Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Response (to Statement of Facts) Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Christy A. Farmer (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibili...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by George T. Farmer (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Christy A. Farmer (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by George T. Farmer (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibili...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Christy A. Farmer (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibili...))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibili...))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher A. Seabock regarding meet and confer)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55.54
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility Claim)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibili...))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.