Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Romero Garcia Daniel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yazdanpanah Hesam, against Lyft Corporation, Mikaelian Vanis, represented by Holder James K., Oberrecht Kimberly Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Anthony J. Mohr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: VANIS MIKAELIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: VANIS MIKAELIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LYFT CORPORATION (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: LYFT CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: DANIEL ROMERO GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: VANIS MIKAELIAN (Defendant); As to: DANIEL ROMERO GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: VANIS MIKAELIAN (Defendant); As to: VANIS MIKAELIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 19, 2021Complaint
Date: August 19, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 19, 2021PI General Order
Date: September 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 02, 2023Answer
Date: March 02, 2023Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 03, 2023Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 03, 2023Summons (on Complaint) Filed by DANIEL ROMERO GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by DANIEL ROMERO GARCIA (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by DANIEL ROMERO GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
May 30, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
May 16, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: why monetary sanctions of $500 should not be imposed due to Plaintiff’s failure to file a proof of service of the summons and complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: why monetary sanctions of $500 should...) | |
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 | |
August 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.