Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Estate Of William Stano, Kelly Sarah, Stano Eric, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Eslamboly-Hakim Sharona, Rein Steven, against General Partners Asset Holdings Inc., Meadows Mindy, Mindy Meadows Lp, South Bay Barba Owner Llc, represented by Trachtman Benjamin R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William A. Crowfoot presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. Crowfoot Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Eric Stano (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: August 18, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 18, 2021PI General Order
Date: September 13, 2021Answer
Date: February 04, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 04, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 24, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 12, 2022Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE: CONTINUING TRIAL AND TRIAL-RELATED DATES
Date: October 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 22, 2022Complaint in Intervention
Date: December 22, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 06, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed by General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by Eric Stano (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff); Estate of William Stano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Eric Stano (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff); Estate of William Stano (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff); Estate of William Stano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff); Estate of William Stano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.