Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alarcon An Individual Victor, Epyon Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Torres An Individual Jorge, Torres Susana, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Almaraz David Michael, Schorr Zachary D, against 1 To 20 Does, Alarcon An Individual Christopher, Alarcon Victor, All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiffs Title Or Any Cloud On Plaintiffs Title Thereto, Epyon Llc A California Limited Liability Company, (total of 8) See All represented by Almaraz David Michael, Gutman Alan Scott, Simkin Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Armen Tamzarian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArmen Tamzarian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: CHRISTOPHER ALARCON, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Alan Scott Gutman (Attorney)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: SUSANA TORRES (Defendant); JORGE TORRES, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens; Filed by: EPYON LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SUSANA TORRES (Defendant); JORGE TORRES, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order Trial Preparation]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Order Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: JORGE TORRES, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Victor Alarcon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate; Filed by: JORGE TORRES, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Tentative Statement Of Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Statement of Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Request for Statement of Decision; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 18, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 01, 2023Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 05, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 04, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 23, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-28T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 12, 2021Complaint
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 12, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 26, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 22, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: October 19, 2021Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION WITH CASE NUMBER 21VEUD00576
Date: October 29, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: October 29, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE JANUARY 26, 20...)
Date: November 02, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF VICTOR ALARCONS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES [CRC 3.300(G)]
Date: November 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2021Exhibit List
Date: November 10, 2021Exhibit List - COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE JANUARY 26, 20...)
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATION)
Date: November 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; CASE MANAGEMENT CO...)
Date: November 18, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 23, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 27, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: February 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Consolidation) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Michael Simkin (Attorney)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SUSANA TORRES (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: EPYON LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: EPYON LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CHRISTOPHER ALARCON, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: VICTOR ALARCON, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Objection re Proposed Judgment; Filed by: EPYON LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Tentative Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION
Date: February 25, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]
Date: February 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ADR)
Date: February 25, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: March 08, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: April 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: April 07, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 11, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: May 23, 2022Separate Statement
Date: June 10, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: June 10, 2022Exhibit List
Date: June 10, 2022Answer
Date: June 24, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER
Date: July 18, 2022Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: July 21, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO FILE FIRST AMENDED AN...)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: July 29, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: August 08, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: August 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: August 17, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 17, 2022Motion to Bifurcate
Date: September 14, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 26, 2022Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE CHRISTOPHER ALARCON AND EYPON LLC...)
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: September 30, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 12, 2022Exhibit List
Date: October 12, 2022Answer
Date: October 13, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRIFURCATE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS
Date: October 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; HEARING ON MOTION T...)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: November 14, 2022Witness List
Date: November 14, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: November 14, 2022Exhibit List
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE (CF 1...)
Date: November 16, 2022Exhibit List - [PROPOSED] JOINT FIRST AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 07, 2022Witness List - [PROPOSED] FIRST AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - (AMENDED)
Date: December 08, 2022Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT VICTOR ALARCON’S TRIAL BRIEF
Date: January 04, 2023Trial Brief
Date: January 04, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: January 04, 2023Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS EPYON LLC AND CHRISTOPHER ALARCON’S TRIAL BRIEF
Date: January 04, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: January 05, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 05, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS)
Date: January 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS)
Date: January 09, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 09, 2023Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS)
Date: January 10, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: January 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 23, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 15, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/23/2023
Date: January 23, 2023Objection - OBJECTION TO TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Request for Statement of Decision
Date: February 02, 2023Statement of Decision
Date: February 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: February 06, 2023Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: February 10, 2023Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: February 10, 2023Objection - OBJECTION RE PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2023Response - RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT FOLLOWING TRIAL
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: February 24, 2023Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2023
Date: February 24, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JUDGMENT
Date: February 24, 2023Judgment
Date: February 24, 2023Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 27, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: February 27, 2023Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: March 02, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 13, 2023Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: March 14, 2023Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Case Management Co...))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Victor Alarcon))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Motion re: (TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION WITH CASE NUMBER 21VEUD00576)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance The January 26, 20...))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Consolidation) of )
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Order (Trial Preparation)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S AMENDED MOTION TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION WITH CASE NUMBER 21VEUD00576)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Consolidation))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF VICTOR ALARCONS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES [CRC 3.300(g)])
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE THE JANUARY 26, 20...))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re ADR))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Case Management Co...) of )
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation])
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Victor Alarcon))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance The January 26, 20...))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Motion re: (TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION WITH CASE NUMBER 21VEUD00576)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF VICTOR ALARCONS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES [CRC 3.300(g)])
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE THE JANUARY 26, 20...))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S AMENDED MOTION TO STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION WITH CASE NUMBER 21VEUD00576)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Consolidation) of 11/18/2021)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Case Management Co...))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Consolidation))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Order (Trial Preparation)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation])
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re ADR))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.