Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mir Jehan Zeb, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Agu Kenechi Reuben, against Dixon Dawnyell Trashawna, Goldman Loren Jacob, Sanchez Garcia Andres Lauro, represented by Miyamoto Ronald K., Olson Sonali, Pasarow Stephen Charles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elizabeth Potter Scully presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Dawnyell Trashawna Dixon (Defendant); As to: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Response to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to advance hearing on motion; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Loren Jacob Goldman (Defendant); As to: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to consolidate hearing and advance hearing; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration of Order to Dismiss Complaint; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant); As to: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Reply To Opposition To Motion To Tax Cost; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Cause (170.1/170.3); Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Loren Jacob Goldman (Defendant)
Date: September 08, 2023Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; Filed by: Dawnyell Trashawna Dixon (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUING THE HEARING IN DEPARTMENT 1)
Date: August 22, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuing the Hearing in Department 1) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 28, 2021Complaint
Date: July 28, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: August 06, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 22, 2021Answer
Date: December 28, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OR RETROACTIVE AUTHORIZATIO...)
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OR RETROACTIVE AUTHORIZATIO...)
Date: September 12, 2022Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 13, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 16, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 22, 2022Motion for Reconsideration - MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT
Date: September 26, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARING AND ADVANCE HEARING
Date: September 28, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 29, 2022Motion to Tax Costs
Date: October 11, 2022Exhibit List
Date: October 14, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION
Date: October 28, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: November 14, 2022Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT GOLDMAN'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: November 18, 2022Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT ANDRE LAURO SANCHEZ GARCIA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: November 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER TO DISMISS COM...)
Date: November 21, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COST
Date: November 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: November 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: November 29, 2022Objection - PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE DECLARATION
Date: December 07, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 11/29/2022
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER TO DISMISS COM...)
Date: December 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: December 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 18, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/25/2023
Date: January 25, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 25, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: January 27, 2023Notice of Motion
Date: February 15, 2023Motion for Reconsideration
Date: February 15, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed by Kenechi Reuben Agu (Attorney)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Loren Jacob Goldman (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings to consolidate hearings on motions for r...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal or Retroactive Authorizatio...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration (of Order to Dismiss Complaint) Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Response (to Order to Show Cause) Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge Declaration Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Dawnyell Trashawna Dixon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by Loren Jacob Goldman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to consolidate hearing and ad...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Dawnyell Trashawna Dixon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration of Order to Dismiss Com...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuing the Hearing in Department 1)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Request by Jehan Zeb Mir to Vacate Prefiling O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Loren Jacob Goldman (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to consolidate hearing and advance hearing) Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration) Filed by Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal or Retroactive Authorizatio...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition To Motion To Tax Cost) Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to advance hearing on motion) Filed by Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kenechi Reuben Agu (Attorney)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Continuing the Hearing in Department 1) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Serena Wong, CSR #10250; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Loren Jacob Goldman (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Dawnyell Trashawna Dixon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge Declaration; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Dawnyell Trashawna Dixon (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Hearing Re: Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Jehan Zeb Mir (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: January 18, 2022Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 28, 2022Answer
Date: April 28, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: April 28, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 28, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTIONS)
Date: October 31, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to advance hearing on motions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration of Order to Dismiss Com...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Dawnyell Trashawna Dixon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Andres Lauro Sanchez Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.