Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sachs Kent, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aiwazian Edwin, against Charles Pankow Builders Ltd, Pankow Operating Inc., represented by Maltin Phillip Robert, Wallin Allison S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Kent Sachs, individually and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated, against Pankow Operating, Inc., Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd., and Does 1 through 100. The complaint a...
Complaint
Date: July 27, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Kent Sachs (Plaintiff); As to: Pankow Operating, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Kent Sachs (Plaintiff); As to: Pankow Operating, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kent Sachs (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service (Summons Pankow Operating, Inc.) Filed by Kent Sachs (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Class Action)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Removal to United States District Court Filed by Charles Pankow Builders, LTD (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Kent Sachs (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Kent Sachs (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd's Answer to Complaint Filed by Charles Pankow Builders, LTD (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Kent Sachs (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Re: Notice of Case Management Conference) Filed by Kent Sachs (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Class Action))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court))
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Summons Charles Pankow Builders, LTD and Pankow Operating, Inc.)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Removal)
Date: November 18, 2021Proof of Service by Mail (Re: Notice of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd's Answer to Complaint
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service (Summons Charles Pankow Builders, LTD)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of 11/12/2021)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Removal to United States District Court
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service (Summons Pankow Operating, Inc.)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.