Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ghaed Javad, Ghaed Ladan, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Adams Thomas Gregory, against Jiles Staysia, Jones Daniel L., Jones Norris Holdings Inc. Dba Health Coverage Fast, represented by Lorch Gary Jay, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Professional Malpractice (Not Medical Or Legal) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ladan Ghaed (Plaintiff); Javad Ghaed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ladan Ghaed (Plaintiff); Javad Ghaed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ladan Ghaed (Plaintiff); Javad Ghaed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ladan Ghaed (Plaintiff); Javad Ghaed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: August 29, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 14, 2021Complaint
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 15, 2021Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 02, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 08, 2022Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 06, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 06, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 07, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION
Date: September 07, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 20, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.