Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Howard Sonya, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Clinica Medica General, Lucero Peter, Valencia Patty, represented by Irwin Gabriel Marsh, Kelly John, Medel Eric, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Malcolm H. Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Professional Health Care Malpractice (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Opposition to Notice of Motion and Special Motion; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Opposition to Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Patty Valencia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: Patty Valencia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Clinica Medica General; On the Complaint filed by Sonya Howard on
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Clinica Medica General (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection - Pleadings]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: April 06, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Clinica Medica General (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Patty Valencia; On the Complaint filed by Sonya Howard on
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clinica Medica General (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00First Amended Summons; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Opposition to Opposition to Disqualify Judge; Filed by: Sonya Howard (Plaintiff)
Date: November 30, 2022Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Clinica Medica General (Defendant); Peter Lucero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: July 06, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 06, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: July 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION)
Date: July 27, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 25, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 01, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 02, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 06, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 08, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 29, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: January 03, 2022Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: January 26, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 28, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: February 25, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: March 18, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: March 25, 2022Request For Copies
Date: April 08, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 08, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 13, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: April 13, 2022Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: April 13, 2022Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 13, 2022Summons - FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS
Date: April 14, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 05, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AMENDED
Date: May 17, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 23, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: May 31, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFFS ...)
Date: September 15, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO OPPOSITION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE
Date: November 30, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection - Pleadings])
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination) of )
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of )
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt (CC...) of )
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt (CC...))
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (AMENDED)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Notice of Motion and Special Motion)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00First Amended Summons
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection - Pleadings])
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination) of 07/27/2021)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.