Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Liberty Mutual Lmic, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ramirez Jose Jr, represented by Wang Christina Emily Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jill T. Feeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Liberty Mutual LMIC (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Ramirez, Jr (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 21, 2022Notice of Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Liberty Mutual LMIC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 21, 2022PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 23, 2021Petition for Coordination
Date: June 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: July 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: December 07, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: December 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL;)
Date: December 21, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL;) OF 12/21/2022
Date: December 21, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Petition of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company to Open Uninsured Motorist Discovery Case
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (rejected.)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (NO POS - NO ANSWER OR RESPONSIVE PLEADING YET FILED)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.